LITTLE GREENWICH BOOKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Little Greenwich Books is an early years reading charity serving Greenwich and Bexley in south-east London. We collect, check, clean and re-distribute pre-loved books for babies and young children. We also create age-appropriate gift bags of new books, designed with care to help inspire a love of reading at the earliest possible age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Greenwich
Governance
- 21 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Sams | Chair | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geeta Sharma | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katalin Sutton | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300 | £510 | |
|
Total expenditure | £183 | £523 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LITERACY IN YOUNG CHILDREN, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN AGED UNDER FIVE YEARS FROM SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED FAMILIES OR IN HOSPITALS, HOSPICES, OR OTHER CARE INSTITUTIONS IN GREENWICH AND BEXLEY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING BOOKS, FREE LEARNING RESOURCES, ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 CLINTON AVENUE
WELLING
KENT
DA16 2DZ
- Phone:
- 07899937441
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window