FAQIR AWAAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Faqir Awaan Foundation was set up to help those that need financial support or any other means of support in the UK and around the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bradford City
- Bangladesh
- India
- Pakistan
- The Gambia
Governance
- 13 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kaiser Mahmood Mohammad | Chair | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shawkat Mahmood | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fazal Mahmood | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shahid Mahmood Mohammad | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arshad Mahmood | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 150 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK, PAKISTAN, BANGLADESH, INDIA AND AFRICA THROUGH PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AUTO PRESTIGE HOUSE
2 ROSSE STREET
BRADFORD
BD8 9AS
- Phone:
- 01274488500
- Email:
- km014e2489@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window