SCIENCE CREATES OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in science, technology, engineering, arts, maths, business, innovation and entrepreneurship; and the promotion of public awareness, understanding, appreciation and engagement with science, technology, engineering, arts and maths. Provision of workshops, courses, work experience, internships and other facilities, equipment and services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 August 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Caroline Holmes Clark MEng, PhD | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Grace Russell | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harry Destecroix | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jeremy Myles Tavare | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.47k | £92.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.94k | £89.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 APR 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING, ARTS, MATHS, BUSINESS, INNOVATION AND ENTREPRENEURSHIP; AND 3.1.2 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC AWARENESS, UNDERSTANDING, APPRECIATION AND ENGAGEMENT WITH SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING, ARTS AND MATHS, BY THE SUPPORT OF STUDY AND RESEARCH, PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, COURSES, WORK EXPERIENCE, INTERNSHIPS AND OTHER FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Science Creates
Old Market
Midland Road
Bristol
BS2 0JZ
- Phone:
- 01174034035
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window