THE ANNE CARPMAEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote protect and preserve the flora and fauna found in Goring-on-Thames, Oxfordshire and within a radius of 10 miles To provide financial assistance to the schools and other organisations in the villages of Goring-on-Thames, Streatley and the surrounding areas so that pupils and members can be taught and learn about this flora and fauna For the general education with regard to nature
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,986 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 24 May 2022: CIO registration
- 29 May 2024: Funds received from 1102152 THE ANNE CARPMAEL CHARITABLE TRUST
- WITHYMEAD NATURE RESERVE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER ANN HEDGE | Chair | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Philip Rooney | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Ambler | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Cooke | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila McKenzie | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aine McCartney | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Glen Beamson | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kay Smitham | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Victoria Smart | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £36.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £54.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"): (1) TO PROMOTE PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE FLORA AND FAUNA FOUND IN GORING-ON-THAMES OXFORDSHIRE AND WITHIN A RADIUS OF TEN MILES FROM THE VILLAGE; (2) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE SCHOOLS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE VILLAGES OF GORING-ON-THAMES STREATLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS SO THAT THE PUPILS AND THE MEMBERS OF THESE ORGANISATIONS CAN BE TAUGHT AND LEARN ABOUT THIS FLORA AND FAUNA AND NATURE; (3) FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO NATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Withy Mead
Bridle Way
Goring
READING
RG8 0HS
- Phone:
- 01491872265
- Email:
- info@withymead.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window