384TH BOMBARDMENT GROUP MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by means of the establishment and maintenance of a museum & exhibition on the subject of the 384th Bomb Group based at Grafton Underwood during World War 2, the associated role of the USAAF (United States Army Air Force) and the varied influence this had on the area of Kettering/East Northamptonshire both directly and indirectly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neill Howarth | Chair | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matt Smith | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Duncan Andrews | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY MEANS OF THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM & EXHIBITION ON THE SUBJECT OF THE USAAF (UNITED STATES ARMY AIR FORCE) 384TH BOMBARDMENT GROUP BASED AT GRAFTON UNDERWOOD DURING WORLD WAR 2, THE ASSOCIATED ROLE OF THE USAAF AND THE VARIED INFLUENCE THIS HAD ON THE AREA OF KETTERING/EAST NORTHAMPTONSHIRE BOTH DIRECTLY AND INDIRECTLY, THROUGH THE UTILISATION OF EXISTING HISTORICAL BUILDINGS ON THE ORIGINAL SITE OF THE AIRFIELD, AND SUITABLE AUTHENTIC ARTEFACTS & DOCUMENTS RELATING TO THE ERA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 BOWLAND DRIVE
BARTON SEAGRAVE
KETTERING
NN15 6TX
- Phone:
- 07495068108
- Email:
- kdandrews2017@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window