BETHANY FAITH MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS AND SOCIAL SERVICES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JESURATNAM MOHANADAS CHRISTY | Chair | 30 May 2002 |
|
|||||
John Christopher Amburose | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Selvarasa Sarvendran | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thangiah Magimai Israel Sathiyaraj | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esther Suresh | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joel Suthesh | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Bastianz | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
THIVAKARAN THANARATNASABAPATHY | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 4.2 TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 4.3 TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BETHANY HOUSE
12 Park Avenue
SOUTHALL
UB1 3AJ
- Phone:
- 02085712156
- Email:
- bethanychurchuk@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window