WAUNLWYD OAP ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 519797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We hold a luncheon club every week which is attended by about 40 pensioners, We also host aweekly kniting class and monthly coffee mornings and quizes Coffee mornings are now weekly and luncheon club monthly

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2,490
Total expenditure: £4,893

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Blaenau Gwent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WAUN-LWYD OAP ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DERRICK BEVAN Chair
None on record
Gaynor Bevan Trustee
None on record
DILYS COX Trustee
None on record
GLENYS MAY MORGAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.28k £14.85k £3.87k £3.00k £2.49k
Total expenditure £3.66k £2.28k £2.99k £2.66k £4.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.55k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 BRYNHYFRYD TERRACE
WAUNLWYD
EBBW VALE
NP23 6TW
Phone:
01495370668
Website:

No information available