ARC INITIATIVE

Charity Number: 1199808

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A charitable organisation that offers consultancy to young adults from under-resourced communities to advance social mobility through varied programmes focused on CV Writing, Interview preparation, growth mindset, self-awareness training, hybrid working principles & 1:1 mentoring. The aim and focus will be empowering and engaging individuals, resulting in positive, sustainable change.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £15,000
Total expenditure: £32,502

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephanie Nicola Chair 27 July 2022
None on record
Craig Wright Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Conrad Benjamin Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £19.98k £15.00k
Total expenditure £2.45k £32.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
85 Great Portland Street
First Floor
London
W1W 7LT
Phone:
020 7459 4879