BAABUL ISLAM TRUST

Charity number: 1198632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We run a masjid in Wakefield.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £39,705
Total expenditure: £7,415

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abdul Sattar Asim Chair 01 April 2022
QUBA WELFARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Mohammad Usman Javed Trustee 12 December 2023
None on record
Abdullah Asim Trustee 01 April 2022
QUBA WELFARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MOHAMMAD HABIB-UR RAHMAN Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.53k £39.71k
Total expenditure £10.84k £7.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Babul Islam Trust
Benjamin St
Wakefield
WF2 9AR
Phone:
07917433314
Website:

No information available