EMOTION DYSREGULATION IN AUTISM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing youth social action in the form of youth-led raising awareness workshops about youth mental health and autism to marginalised communities Providing psychologically-informed peer support to emotionally dysregulated and autistic young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £70,992 from 11 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Burns | Chair | 23 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Seamus Aiden Scott | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr LISA THOMAS-GRAY DR | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG YOUNG AUTISTIC AND ASPERGIC PEOPLE AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH "EMOTION DYSREGULATION" BETWEEN THE AGES OF 12 AND 25 RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY: (I) PROVIDING PSYCHOLOGICALLY INFORMED PEER SUPPORT; (II) PROVIDING TRAINING TO CLINICIANS AND COMMUNITIES (INCLUDING THROUGH CONSULTATION AND COMMUNITY WORKSHOPS IN PLACES OF WORSHIP, SCHOOLS, YOUTH GROUPS ETC.) TO HELP ADVANCE UNDERSTANDING OF THE NEEDS AND BEHAVIOUR PATTERNS OF “EMOTIONALLY DYSREGULATED AUTISTICS” (HIGH-FUNCTIONING AUTISTICS WITH A RISK OF SELF-HARM); AND (III) PROMOTING RESEARCH, POLICY AND YOUTH SOCIAL ACTION INTO HIGH-FUNCTIONING AUTISM AND RELATED SUBJECTS OF STUDY SURROUNDING EMOTION DYSREGULATION IN AUTISM TO CARE AGENCIES AND THE NHS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Companies 999 Ltd
Blackthorn House
Mary Ann Street
BIRMINGHAM
B3 1RL
- Phone:
- 07401708999
- Email:
- info@emotiondysregautism.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window