FULKING VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are to establish and run a village hall and to promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Fulking
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Anne Page | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Charles Stace | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Graham Loveless | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Boarder | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL VAUGHAN TRIST | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Timothy Andrew Jagger | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Murray | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA CELIA MARY ROBINSON | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Green | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Mark Hind | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FULKING WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FULKING VILLAGE HALL
THE STREET
FULKING
HENFIELD
BN5 9LX
- Phone:
- 01273857552
- Email:
- village.hall@fulking.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window