BUXTON FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Buxton FC Foundation (BFCF) is passionate about creating opportunities for children and young people to be involved in football and we firmly believe that finances should not be the reason anyone misses out. We are working to make football accessible to all local families, subsidising fees and kit costs, which would otherwise be a barrier to taking part.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 25 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer McBain | Chair | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Hopkins | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Kilvert | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Hopkins | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.79k | £18.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £8.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BUXTON FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING FACILITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 3.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND OTHER PERSONS INCLUDING ACADEMIC, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND 3.5 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUXTON FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION
SILVERLANDS
BUXTON
DERBYSHIRE
SK17 6QH
SK17 6QH
- Phone:
- 0129823197
- Email:
- foundation@buxtonfc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window