GLOUCESTER EVANGELICAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gloucester Evangelical Presbyterian Church exists to lead the community in worshipping the Lord Jesus Christ, and to advance the Christian faith for the benefit of all. We meet in Gloucester weekly on Sundays for morning and evening worship, and on Wednesdays for Bible study, prayer, and fellowship. Fortnightly on Fridays we also run a club for young people to enjoy food, games, and Bible study.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Vincent Cochran | Chair | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Faux | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Tim Dalton | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Pfeiffer | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.44k | £34.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.29k | £36.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 DENMARK ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL1 3HZ
- Phone:
- 07810268284
- Email:
- mcochran@worldwitness.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window