Trustees CRAWLEY SWIMMING CLUB
Charity number: 1199370

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Wilson | Chair | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jennifer Gomez | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Twocock | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Victoria Best | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Ford | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Scott Jakins | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
William PHILPOTT | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Penfold | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Field | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jane Sultana | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Lee | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Diane Spencer | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gordon John Dudman | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.