EI SMART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ei SMART provides resources to health professionals and parents to support child development, as well as delivering training courses to support professional development. We collaborate on research to advance practice in early intervention, and we influence policy on the care of high risk infants. These resources are based on our framework for improving developmental outcomes for high risk infants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Cattell | Chair | 21 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Topun Austin | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Warner-McLoughlin BSc | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.04k | £35.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.47k | £13.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF BABIES AT RISK OF DEVELOPMENTAL CHALLENGES BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THEIR CARE AND TREATMENT AND BY WORKING COLLABORATIVELY WITH PARENTS AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS PROVIDING RESOURCES, ADVICE, AND TRAINING. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 The Mall
LONDON
N14 6LN
- Phone:
- 07712051605
- Email:
- info@eismart.co.uk
- Website:
-
eismart.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window