Financial history ALT VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 519835
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.70m £1.77m £2.22m £1.32m £3.48m
Total expenditure £1.62m £1.44m £1.60m £1.34m £1.66m
Income from government contracts £165.00k £165.00k £165.00k £165.00k £165.00k
Income from government grants £170.04k £370.19k £544.67k £120.33k £237.19k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £110.52k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.70m £1.76m £2.22m £1.30m £3.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.75k £11.07k £0 £21.62k £19.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.62m £1.44m £1.60m £1.34m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.20k £10.20k £11.10k £11.10k £11.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0