BROWNSOVER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brownsover Community Association covers the whole of the Brownsover area in Rugby, Warwickshire. It provides a number of services to the local community and works in partnership with local organisations. It runs the Brownsover Community Centre in Bow Fell, Rugby, supports the Brownsover Youth Hut, works in partnership to improve Brownsover for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,500 from 5 government contract(s) and £4,207 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 02 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Webb | Chair | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Noorjahan SAYANI | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robinson | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Bone | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Clare | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.73k | £19.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.15k | £32.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £7.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.50k | £4.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF BROWNSOVER IN RUGBY, WARWICKSHIRE, AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BROWNSOVER, RUGBY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROWNSOVER COMMUNITY CENTRE
BOW FELL
RUGBY
CV21 1JF
- Phone:
- 07798908972
- Email:
- bovercah@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window