SOUTH OXFORDSHIRE MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and advance the Islamic faith in Oxfordshire for the benefit of the public mainly but not exclusively through the provision of a mosque, Islamic education, a celebration of religious festivals, interfaith activity and to provide guidance about the religious and spiritual wellbeing to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 August 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mus Ab Shaharom | Chair | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zeeshan Najmi | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aleem Mir | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hina Mutahar islam | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Islam | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 AUG 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO ESTABLISH AND ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN OXFORDSHIRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A MOSQUE, ISLAMIC EDUCATION, A CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, INTERFAITH ACTIVITY AND TO PROVIDE GUIDANCE ABOUT THE RELIGIOUS AND SPIRITUAL WELLBEING TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH OXFORDSHIRE MUSLIM ASSOCIATION (SOMA)
140 Broadway
DIDCOT
Oxfordshire
OX11 8RJ
- Phone:
- 07545269295
- Email:
- SOMA.DIDCOT@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window