KIDSHELP CAMBODIA - ENGLAND

Charity Number: 1199367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the association is the advancement of education of children and young adults from identified villages in communes of Prek Dambang, Prek Tamak and Rokakoang2 in Kandal Province in the Kingdom of Cambodia in particular but not exclusively by providing educational scholarships, educational materials and supplementing teacher salaries.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £8,321
Total expenditure: £7,921

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambodia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patrick Gordon Byron Chair 12 March 2017
None on record
Simon William Epstein Trustee 16 April 2022
None on record
Leslie Anne Byron Trustee 12 March 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.91k £7.94k £8.32k
Total expenditure £7.77k £11.94k £7.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 FAREWELL HALL WEST FARM
DARLINGTON ROAD
DURHAM
DH1 3SX
Phone:
07482720660
Website:

No information available