DEBRE YDRAS ST GEORGE ERITREAN ORTHODOX TEWAHDO COMMUNITY CHURCH BIRMINGHAM UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 June 2022: CIO registration
- DY.STGEORGE.EOTCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanuel Weldyohanis | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paulos Gebregziabher | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Semret Berhane | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TESFALIDET BERHE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Tsaedu Ghidey Haile | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Kinfe Gebregergsh Beyene | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sirak Asfaha | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 March 2025 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 March 2025 | 251 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, PROVIDING PASTORAL CARE BY CARRYING OUT MISSIONARY / OUTREACH WORK AND CREATE A NETWORK OF SUPPORT SERVICES FOR ALL MEMBERS, ESPECIALLY FOR REFUGEES IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
169 EAST MEADWAY
BIRMINGHAM
B33 0EN
- Phone:
- 07306161684
- Email:
- dystgeorgeeotcc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window