THE CALDICOT MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the understanding of the musical arts, in particular choral music by the presentation of concerts and similar activities. To provide opportunities for music learning and choral singing in a warm and friendly environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 January 2023: CIO registration
- 10 February 2025: Funds received from 512834 THE CALDICOT MALE VOICE CHOIR
- C?R MEIBION CALDICOT (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM VIVIAN HUGHES | Chair | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Jonathon Walker | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN RICHARDS | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
LEON JONES | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
LYNDON CLIVE GAUNTLETT | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MARK YEARSLEY | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth James Cooper | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNDERSTANDING OR THE MUSICAL ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR CHORAL MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT:- (A) TO CO-OPERATE WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND CULTURAL SOCIETIES; (B) TO RAISE FUNDS BY MEANS OF SUBSCRIPTIONS, DONATIONS, GRANTS AND OTHER LAWFUL MEANS. (C) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caldicot Choir Hall
Mill Lane
CALDICOT
NP26 4BN
- Phone:
- 01291431760
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window