ANGOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Signposting and support service for individuals and their families following a cancer or life-limiting illness diagnosis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,860 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 10 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNMARIE THOMAS | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Linda Williams | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Devonald-Davies | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||
DR IAN WYN REES | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||
GWENDA DAVIES OWEN | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAYNE DANIELS | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DERIS DAVIES WILLIAMS | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev ELDON PHILLIPS | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANITA MARIA HUWS | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DERITH JUSTINE POWELL | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH PERRY | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.02k | £24.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.08k | £13.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 May 2022 as amended on 08 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH A LIFE ALTERING OR LIFE LIMITING ILLNESS SUCH AS (BUT NOT LIMITED TOO) CANCER BY PROVIDING BESPOKE USER-LED ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES, OFFERING ADVICE AND PROMOTING LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES, AS WELL AS OFFERING FREE LEGAL AND FINANCIAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN SAFE ENABLING NON-CLINICAL SETTINGS IN CARMARTHENSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CABIN
Park House
Carmarthen Road
KIDWELLY
Dyfed
- Phone:
- 07380 125690
- Email:
- support@angor.org.uk
- Website:
-
angor.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window