Trustees GRESLEY MALE VOICE CHOIR
Charity number: 519870

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Addison | Chair | 16 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Mart | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Baines | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HAYWOOD | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lilley | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Langley | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence John Jones | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edward Grummett | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Arthur Cox | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
HENRY ROBERT HURD | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dave Wright | Trustee | 17 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE HEATH LAWTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Geoffrey Hampson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KARL WILLIAM HARPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN HICKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK ROBERT BARTLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.