CONNIE MEDICAL CHAIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The development and supply of the Connie Medical Chair to PICUs and Pediatric High Dependency Units, at no cost, to support the treatment of children with life limiting conditions and children who require major surgery and time in a critical care unit, helping them to reach their potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Williams | Chair | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Shaw | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Saji Mathew Chakkumkel | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY DEVELOPING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, NOT NORMALLY AVAILABLE BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 COMMON VIEW
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN4 8RG
- Phone:
- 03300012492
- Email:
- russ@conniemedicalchair.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window