LONDON COLNEY ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity offers a wide range of services including praying facilities for the Muslim faith. There are also evening sessions for children and adult education including weekend sessions. It does also offer interfaith session from time to time and a food bank to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 2022: CIO registration
- 31 March 2023: Funds received from 1131596 LONDON COLNEY ISLAMIC CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammad Reshad Nunhuck | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohamud Shakeel Khodabocus | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mirza Abdul Aly Shipkolye | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nasrullah Sohawon | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Yaasir Khan Jamalkhan | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Omer Alhayek | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nasserkhan Jamalkhan | Trustee | 30 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.32k | £157.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.65k | £142.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 April 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 April 2024 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN LONDON COLNEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF ISLAMIC STUDIES AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS INDIVIDUALS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FUNDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON COLNEY ISLAMIC MOSQUE
174-174A HIGH STREET
LONDON COLNEY
ST. ALBANS
AL2 1JY
- Phone:
- 03002340786
- Email:
- hello@lcic.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window