STANTONBURY ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Draws together 6 congregations into one organisation to enable effective governance and management. Shares resources in participation in Mission, Outreach, and Social action Creates a shared vision for prayer, worship and mutual support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 04 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Chibuzor Kenechukwu Okpala | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip James Dunning | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Charles Parkes Haseldine | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Penelope Ann Miller | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Slee | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr SAMUEL RAJAKUMAR MUTHUVELOE | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adrian John Prisk | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Fletcher | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Stammers | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David George William Preston | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE LEP ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING DENOMINATIONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE LEP MAY ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES, PRACTICES AND TRADITIONS SET OUT IN THE PARTNERSHIP AGREEMENT ENTERED INTO BY THE PARTICIPATING DENOMINATIONS; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; AND E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS. F) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING DENOMINATIONS BY MAKING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRIST CHURCH
STANTONBURY
PURBECK
STANTONBURY
- Phone:
- 01908605815
- Email:
- aprisk@doctors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window