CA WALES AREA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A fellowship of men and women that share their experience, strength and hope to help each other recover from drug addiction. Members gather in meetings to share the 12 step process of recovery from addiction, and provide 1 to 1 support. There are no restrictions on membership other than a person having a desire to stop using Cocaine and all other mind altering substances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 08 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Noel Williams Hopkins | Chair | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Charles Goddard | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Miles | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WHO ARE ADDICTED TO COCAINE AND/OR OTHER MIND-ALTERING SUBSTANCES IN WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Fitzhamon Close
COWBRIDGE
South Glamorgan
CF71 7GG
- Phone:
- 07772077570
- Email:
- trustees@cawales.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window