NEUADD DYFI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Hall for the use of the inhabitants of Aberdyfi
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 17 February 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DESMOND BRIAN GEORGE | Chair |
|
||||||||
Ian Hewins | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Catrin O'Neill | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jan Rajput | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Gilian Miranda | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Kelly | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Sandy Andrews | Trustee | 17 August 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Louis Hiatt | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY JOHN MACGREGOR-BOWRON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN RAYMOND REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TREVOR LUMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MEGAN REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DEWI OWEN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.46k | £37.87k | £39.97k | £284.14k | £34.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.87k | £12.26k | £16.91k | £54.18k | £25.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.00k | £11.13k | £250.65k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 24 DECEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 15 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF ABERDOVEY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF ABERDOVEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 ABER VILLAS
ABERDOVEY
LL35 0HR
- Phone:
- 01654767251
- Email:
- mail@neuadddyfi.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window