WISHING OTHERS WELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the efficiency and effectiveness of charities and the effective use of charitable resources for the benefit of the public in England and Wales by providing consultancy, advice and other services designed to support the administration, infrastructure and operation of charities and voluntary organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Paul Swaisland | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Laura Swaisland | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Michael Haberfield | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/07/2023 | 25/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £13.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.58k | £11.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY PROVIDING CONSULTANCY, ADVICE AND OTHER SERVICES DESIGNED TO SUPPORT THE ADMINISTRATION, INFRASTRUCTURE AND OPERATION OF CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: ‘CHARITIES’ ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; ‘VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS’ ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 14 Kingfisher Court
Newbury
RG14 5SJ
- Phone:
- 03458123990
- Website:
-
wishingotherswell.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window