Trustees WHITWICK HISTORICAL GROUP
Charity number: 519887

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARLENE ANN PEARSON | Chair | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Mary Woolcock | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jayne Collins | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Graham Michael Gee | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE SMITH | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CALCUTT | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHNSON | Trustee | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN COWELL PARTRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GERALD BERRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.