STAND AND BE COUNTED THEATRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the arts, culture and heritage for public benefit through the provision of: -The production, promotion and presentation of public performances of drama, dance, music, comedy, film, digital media and other art forms; -The public presentation, broadcast, or distribution of artistic and cultural exhibitions, programmes and publications; and public classes, workshops, lectures
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 2022: Standard registration
- 21 March 2025: Funds received from 1167703 CURIOUS MONKEY LTD
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor MacFarlane FRSA | Chair | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hamda Shahzad | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Winson | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Ridland | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Inderjit Bhogal | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Reem Doukmak | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jabu Mantombiza Emily Wood B.A. | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Anne Richardson | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £443.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £339.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 APR 2022 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 AUG 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: A. THE PRODUCTION, PROMOTION AND PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES OF DRAMA, DANCE, MUSIC, COMEDY, FILM, DIGITAL MEDIA AND OTHER ART FORMS; B. THE PUBLIC PRESENTATION, BROADCAST, OR DISTRIBUTION OF ARTISTIC AND CULTURAL EXHIBITIONS, PROGRAMMES AND PUBLICATIONS; AND C. PUBLIC CLASSES, WORKSHOPS, LECTURES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING EVENTS; PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WHERE SUCH WORK IS PARTLY OR WHOLLY CREATED BY, WITH, ABOUT, OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WITH LIVED EXPERIENCE OF MIGRATION FROM THE COUNTRIES OF THEIR ORIGIN OR DOMICILE BY REASON OF WAR, HOSTILITY, PERSECUTION, OPPRESSION, DISCRIMINATION, CLIMATE CHANGE, NATURAL DISASTERS OR SIMILAR CAUSES, AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS; OR WHERE SUCH WORK RAISES PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING PEOPLE WITH LIVED EXPERIENCE OF MIGRATION, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 The Crescent
Shaw
Oldham
OL2 7BP
- Phone:
- 07723401127
- Email:
- info@sbctheatre.co.uk
- Website:
-
sbctheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window