THE TRIPLE H COMMUNITY CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Choral singing and perfomance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 26 April 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard James Duvall | Chair | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wade | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Worthington | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
DENISE HAZLEWOOD | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Squirrell | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Cotts | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOCKLEY & HAWKWELL METHODIST CHURCH
MAIN ROAD
HOCKLEY
SS5 4QY
- Phone:
- 01702543031
- Website:
-
HTTPS://E-VOICE.ORG.UK/TRIPLEHCHOIR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window