Financial history THE KESTEVEN AND SLEAFORD HIGH SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 519897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/07/2019 01/07/2020 01/07/2021 01/07/2022 01/07/2023
Total gross income £5.93k £3.53k £1.82k £3.25k £3.52k
Total expenditure £5.27k £861 £3.67k £1.40k £5.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A