LEGION D'HONNEUR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant funding individuals to recipients of the Legion d'Honneur or their families and / or charitable organisations. Providing mean tested bursaries to children of recipients of the Legion d'Honneur Funding educational projects and / or holding educational events for the general public at which the expertise of the holders of the honour is used.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 October 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claudine RIPERT LANDLER | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Frederic Marius Mourre | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Franck Robert Petitgas | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Sir John McLeod Scarlett | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvie Bermann | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lord Alexander Charles Carlile CBE QC | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250 | |
|
Total expenditure | £240 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) AMONGST RECIPIENTS OF THE LEGION D?HONNEUR AND THEIR PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND DESCENDANTS; AND 2. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT. 'LEGION D'HONNEUR' MEANS THE HIGHEST FRENCH DECORATION PRESENTED ON BEHALF OF THE FRENCH HEAD OF STATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd floor,
28 Austin Friars
EC2N 2QQ
- Phone:
- 02034329891
- Email:
- Uk.smlh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window