DIDSBURY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church holds weekly Sunday services, which are also streamed live on YouTube. It runs a Young Church and related children's and young people's activities, as well as Christian education for all ages through Bible study. The church offers a Christian environment for celebrating and marking life events - infant dedications, weddings and funerals. It is also involved ecumenically.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 13 June 2022: CIO registration
- DIDSBURY BAPTIST CHURCH (BEAVER PARK) (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bertha Chongwain | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Timothy Sheldrake | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Anitha Janjanam | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Sheldrake | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabethe Campos Marshall | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sabrina Beatrix Campos Marshall | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ANNA ELIZABETH WRIGHT | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Elliott | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anna Elizabeth Wright | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Sarah Chambers | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £513.54k | £100.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.58k | £95.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £45.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.76k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £448.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £64.58k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.94k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £5.07k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. 3.2 [NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHURCH FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIDSBURY BAPTIST CHURCH
SCHOOL LANE/BEAVER ROAD
MANCHESTER
M20 6SX
- Phone:
- 01614341451
- Email:
- didsburybaptist@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window