FISHING FOR HEROES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fishing for Heroes CIO was formed from Fishing for Heroes (1135355) in 2022. We continue to support both Veterans and Serving personnel of all British and Commonwealth Armed Forces who are suffering from mental health or physical illness as a result of their service. We help in the improvement of their wellbeing, delivering both individual instruction and get togethers across England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2022: CIO registration
- 14 March 2024: Funds received from 1135355 FISHING FOR HEROES
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Jamieson | Chair | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lester | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tony Campbell | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Clarke DL | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Thomas Organ | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.87k | £96.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.21k | £82.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF BOTH SERVING AND EX-SERVING MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN AND COMMONWEALTH (INCLUDING FORMER COMMONWEALTH) SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRIDDOCK HOUSE
ASHOPTON ROAD
BAMFORD
HOPE VALLEY
S33 0AZ
- Phone:
- 01332667966
- Email:
- info@fishingforheroes.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window