SEVEN SEEDS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Building community centres for development in impoverished, rural areas including education and training to allow people to gain skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Bangladesh
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Sudan
- Syria
- Turkey
- Yemen
Governance
- 24 March 2023: CIO registration
- SEVEN SEEDS CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fatima Begum | Chair | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ismail Ali | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anisah Hussain | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Othmane Chouchane | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdulbaset Abdulnoor Mohammed | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muad Abdulbaset Abdulnoor Mohammed | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eeman Abdulbaset Abdulnoor Mohammed | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 February 2025 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN YEMEN, INCLUDING THOSE WHO MAY BE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Greatorex Street
LONDON
E1 5NP
- Phone:
- 02080883777
- Email:
- support@sevenseeds.org.uk
- Website:
-
sevenseeds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window