PENIEL ASSEMBLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peniel Assembly is a non-denominational, inter-denomination ministry with an apostolic mandate to raise believers from all nations teaching them to observe all the things the Lord has commanded and to bring them to the full knowledge of Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 01 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Solomon Apreala | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Augusta Apreala | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chukwuma Austin Chukwa | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.43k | £28.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.76k | £27.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ENGLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ENGLAND, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS, OR SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 ELM DRIVE
CREWE
CW1 4EL
- Phone:
- 07727050530
- Email:
- ebi@apreala.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window