DE-VINE CHRIST CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrines set out in the statement of faith contained in the schedule, in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom as the Trustees from time to time may think fit, The prevention and relief of poverty, in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom as the Trustees from time to time may think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ibikunle Adewunmi Oduyemi | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||||||
DEBORAH AKINLADE | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||||||
FOLUSO DAWODU | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.75k | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.87k | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE PUBLIC ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE), IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS TRUSTEE FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, 2. THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, (THE OBJECT)
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Padstow Walk
Feltham
TW14 9XU
- Phone:
- 07944042293
- Email:
- devinechristcentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window