LEVEL UP GOSPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are currently developing an inclusive volunteering work experience programme providing a unique forum for socialisation, training and employment skills for young people with additional needs and hope to launch in the spring of 2023. Meanwhile, we are continuing to support local Gosport charities, organisations and businesses with their events and carrying on the work in our allotment space."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,731 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Elizabeth Ive | Chair | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Michael Finn | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Brian Newbold | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Clare Sherman | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diane Hilda Furlong | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Wright | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.75k | £39.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.88k | £16.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN 18 AND 25 LIVING IN GOSPORT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE WITH MILD TO MODERATE (OR HIDDEN) DISABILITIES, WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES SUCH AS ANXIETY OR DEPRESSION, OR ARE NEURODIVERGENT BY PROVIDING GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT AND ORGANISING WORK EXPERIENCE AND COMMUNITY VOLUNTEERING PROGRAMMES, AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOSPORT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
BURY HOUSE (THORNGATE HALLS)
BURY ROAD
GOSPORT
HAMPSHIRE
PO12 3PX
- Phone:
- 07895939510
- Email:
- levelupgosport@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window