FRIENDS OF SWANBOURNE HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Swanbourne House raises funds to enhance the education of pupils at Swanbourne House. The charity also organises events to improve relationships between the parents, staff and pupils at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 04 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanna Claire Batchelor | Chair | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Williman | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Williams | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.01k | £10.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.85k | £4.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swanbourne House School
Swanbourne
Milton Keynes
MK17 0HZ
- Phone:
- 01296720264
- Email:
- fosh@swanbourne.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window