BEZA BUZUHAN ERITREA ORTHODOX MENBERE TSEBAOT MEDHANIEALEM CHURCH NORTH LONDON CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Father Estiphanos Abraham Measho | Chair | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tsegay Yihdego Tekle | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kahase Gebrehiwet Kahsay | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tirhas Tesfay | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.60k | £29.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.16k | £28.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 May 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 May 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE ORIENTAL ORTHODOX CHURCHES, PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ERITREAN COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND SOUTH-EAST ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST THOMAS ROAD
FINSBURY PARK
LONDON
N4 2QP
- Phone:
- 07982434111
- Email:
- info@medhaniealem.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window