MERIDIAN CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meridian Sports and social club provides facilities and services such as Football pitches and multi-sports equipment including, Table tennis board. We also provide a safe environment for our beneficiaries to engage in amature sports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bexley
- Greenwich
Governance
- 15 July 2022: CIO registration
- MERIDIAN SPORTS & SOCIAL CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benedict Kumi | Chair | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eghosa Aiwerioghene | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Attafuah | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION THROUGH PROMOTING AND PROVIDING FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR PARTICIPATING IN SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THAMESMEAD, GREENWICH, BEXLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OFFICE 1729
58 PEREGRINE ROAD
ILFORD
IG6 3SZ
- Phone:
- 07494413644
- Email:
- info@meridiancharity.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window