Trustees THE AFRICA COLLEGE FOUNDATION (UK)
Charity number: 1199415

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jon Samuel | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Levings | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Winter PhD | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linford Llewellyn Andrews | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abel Zvamayida Nyamapfene | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cate Bronstein | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Taddy Adam Paul Blecher | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.