THE LAFROWDA CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To renovate, preserve and maintain the property known as The Lafrowda Club, St Just, Penzance. And to advance the education of the public in the history of West Penwith and preserve, protect, develop and improve features, objects and relics of historical or public interest from the area of St Just and to educate the public in the culture, history and architecture of that same area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 09 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Gowan | Chair | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK MORRIS | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS LUXFORD | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.10k | £10.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.69k | £35.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.48k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 07 October 2024 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 07 October 2024 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 APR 2022 as amended on 16 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO RENOVATE, PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN FOR THE PEOPLE OF ST JUST AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS THE LAFROWDA CLUB, CHAPEL STREET, ST JUST, PENZANCE, TR19 7LS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF WEST PENWITH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING THE LAFROWDA CLUB AS AN ARTS AND HERITAGE CENTRE. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES, OBJECTS AND RELICS OF HISTORICAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA DEFINED AS THAT INCLUDED IN THE AREA CURRENTLY COVERED BY ST JUST TOWN COUNCIL; AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURE, HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THAT SAME AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAFROWDA CLUB
3 CHAPEL STREET
ST. JUST
PENZANCE
CORNWALL
TR19 7LS
- Phone:
- 01736785829
- Email:
- lafrowda.club@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window