NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1199372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Northampton Methodist Church is the registered charity for all of the Methodist worshipping communities within Northampton and the surrounding area. It provides both worship, fellowship and pastoral care from its various buildings within the town, more details available on our website.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £435,709
Total expenditure: £426,254

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David John Speirs Chair 09 May 2022
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
KINGSTHORPE COMMUNITY CHURCH
Recently registered
SHARED CHURCHES (NORTHAMPTON) LIMITED
Received: On time
Jennifer Ruth Richardson Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Dr Hellen Oluoko Okello Trustee 01 September 2023
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
KARIBUNI CHILDREN
Received: On time
Paul James Deakin Trustee 01 December 2022
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Philip Neil Leeson Trustee 01 December 2022
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Frances Perry Trustee 01 December 2022
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Laura Ferris Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Kathryn Stretton Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Patricia Ann Oliver Trustee 01 September 2022
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Charmaine Wareham-Voyce Trustee 01 September 2022
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Jennifer Brooks Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Hilary MacCallum Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
TREVOR JOHN CLARKE Trustee 09 May 2022
KINGSTHORPE COMMUNITY CHURCH
Recently registered
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Linda Caines Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Hilary Walden Trustee 09 May 2022
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
William Keith BROOKS Trustee 09 May 2022
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SHARED CHURCHES (NORTHAMPTON) LIMITED
Received: On time
FAVELL DAY SERVICES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £413.41k £435.71k
Total expenditure £405.73k £426.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 25 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 July 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 05 July 2024 5 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Harpole Methodist Church
School Lane
Harpole
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 4DR
Phone:
01604702178