SPARKS PROJECT CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting residents in disadvantaged areas to improve life chances & wellbeing Crisis support - Food, fuel, data, IAG, mental health & suicide prevention Connections - group sessions, wellbeing, crafting, Baby play/weigh, walking & beach therapy. Coaching - sessions with an inhouse Life Coach. Counselling - sessions with an inhouse Counsellor. Careers - Skills, training & employment support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £121,012 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 September 2022: CIO registration
- SPARKS PROJECT CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Whiteley Mr | Chair | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Susan Baxter | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Boden | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £121.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHARITABLE NEED ARISING BY REASON OF AGE, POOR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN THE COMMUNITIES OF NORTH YORKSHIRE, BY PROVIDING PRACTICAL HANDS-ON SUPPORT AS WELL AS INFORMATION, COUNSELLING, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND COACHING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sparks Project CIO
30 Wreyfield Drive
Scarborough
YO12 6NN
- Phone:
- 07701356900
- Email:
- info@sparksproject.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window