THE GURU PROJECTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Colombia
Governance
- 26 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saruban Pasu BSc MBBS MD(res) FRCOphth | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gurpal Chagger | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Veevers | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Nigel Olliff | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.18k | £10.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.43k | £6.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 March 2025 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 March 2025 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2025 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2025 | 362 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM VISUAL IMPAIRMENT AS A RESULT OF CATARACTS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN COLOMBIA BY THE PROVISION OF CATARACT SURGERY TO RESTORE EYESIGHT AND THE EQUIPMENT REQUIRED TO PERFORM SURGERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 HILLSIDE
EAST DEAN
EASTBOURNE
BN20 0HE
- Phone:
- 07912688778
- Email:
- theguruprojects@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window