HONGKONGERS CITY GOSPEL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and training of those granted refugee status, new immigrants from Hongkong or British National Overseas (BNO) migrants resettling in the UK from Hong Kong, and their dependants in need thereof so as to advance them in life and assist them to adapt within a new community. To advance the Christian faith primarily among the Hongkong diaspora in England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tat Ming Lawrence Law BA | Chair | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yan Wong | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Yan Ho Kenric Hui BTH | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS, NEW IMMIGRANTS FROM HONGKONG OR BRITISH NATIONAL OVERSEAS (BNO) MIGRANTS RESETTLING IN THE UK FROM HONG KONG, AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY AMONG THE HONGKONG DIASPORA IN ENGLAND ACCORDING TO THE STATEMENT OF FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE BIBLE, CONDUCTING RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND PROVIDING PASTORAL CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 SYLVAN AVENUE
BIRMINGHAM
B31 2PG
- Phone:
- 07949026972
- Email:
- LAWRENCELAW_UK@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window