FEEDING THE COMMUNITY STOCKPORT CIO

Charity number: 1200142
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide home cooked meals to the most vulnerable people in our community delivered to their door

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £58,180
Total expenditure: £49,869

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Lancashire
  • Manchester City
  • Stockport

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 August 2022: CIO registration
  • 19 February 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 19 February 2025: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • HANDY LADIES FEEDING THE COMMUNITY (Previous name)
  • HANDY LADIES FEEDING THE COMMUNITY CIC (Previous name)
  • HANDY LADIES FEEDING THE COMMUNITY CIO (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2023
Total gross income £58.18k
Total expenditure £49.87k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window